State of Tennessee ex rel Slatery et al v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Plaintiff: Shari Meghreblian, Herbert H Slatery and State of Tennessee
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company, Conoco, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company and American Agricultural Chemical Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00425
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Shari Meghreblian, Herbert H Slatery, State of Tennessee (Murrey, J)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. Phillips 66 Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian, State of Tennessee. ConocoPhillips Company waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Murrey, J)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Mott and Thompson on 11/14/2018 (JBR).
November 6, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Phillips 66 Company . (BDG, )
November 6, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Phillips 66 Company . (BDG, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dalton Mott (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016126) by Phillips 66 Company. (BDG, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/10/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to J Peter Murrey on 10/11/2018 (JBR).
October 10, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State of Tennessee (JBR)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to United States of America v. Phillips 66 Company, et al., No. 3:18-CV-421. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr., and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 10/10/18. (JBR)
October 10, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JBR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Peter Murrey by State of Tennessee. (JBR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel Buntin. Informational only. (SAC, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )Notice mailed to attorney Murrey.
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3780979.), filed by Herbert H Slatery, Shari Meghreblian. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Buntin, Wilson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Tennessee ex rel Slatery et al v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Dalton Mott
Represented By: James F Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Agricultural Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Meghreblian
Represented By: Wilson Sinclair Buntin
Represented By: J Peter Murrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert H Slatery
Represented By: Wilson Sinclair Buntin
Represented By: J Peter Murrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Wilson Sinclair Buntin
Represented By: J Peter Murrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?