Weaver v. Security Credit Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Weaver
Defendant: Security Credit Services, LLC and Jacob Law Group, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00428
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, The Show Cause Order (Doc. 8) is accordingly DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/27/18. (KFB, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Weaver. (Snyder, Brent)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James David Nave on behalf of All Defendants (Nave, James)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER,It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one days of the date of entry of this Order: (1) Defendants shall each respond to the complaint; OR (2) Plaintiff shall move for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) against any Defendantwho has not responded to the complaint; OR (3) Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/6/18. (KFB, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Weaver. Security Credit Services, LLC served on 10/5/2018. (Snyder, Brent)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Weaver. Jacob Law Group, PLLC served on 10/5/2018. (Snyder, Brent)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information,Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/2/2018. (JCK)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/2/2018. (JCK)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/2/2018. (JCK)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jacob Law Group, PLLC, Security Credit Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jacob Law Group)(JCK)
October 2, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (JCK)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3782003.), filed by Michael Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Other cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Collection Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit sworn denial, #4 Exhibit state court summary, #5 Exhibit fax from Jacob, #6 Summons Summons SCS, #7 Summons Summons Jacob)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Security Credit Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Weaver
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Credit Services, LLC
Represented By: James David Nave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Law Group, PLLC
Represented By: James David Nave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?