Reese v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Reese
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00442
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, IFP Order and Plaintiff's SSN served on U.S. Attorney, OGC, Attorney Gen on 10/29/18, filed by Debra Ann Reese. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/17/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re IFP Service (ABF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/16/18. (ABF)
October 16, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3789988) filed by Debra Ann Reese . (RLK)
October 15, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (RLK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3789988.) by Debra Ann Reese. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing PA Supreme Ct, #2 Certificate of Good Standing WDPA, #3 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Debra Ann Reese. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Debra Ann Reese. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for USAO-Knoxville, #3 Summons for OGC, #4 Summons for Atty Gen)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Reese
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?