Salem Pointe Capital, LLC v. BEP Rarity Bay, LLC et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Salem Pointe Capital, LLC
Defendant: BEP Rarity Bay, LLC and Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00443
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Debra C Poplin
1 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Salem Pointe Capital, LLC. (Swartwood, Garrett)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Swartwood, Garrett)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims by BEP Rarity Bay, LLC, Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC (Ramsey, Shane)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by BEP Rarity Bay, LLC, Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC. (Ramsey, Shane)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Salem Pointe Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swartwood, Garrett)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Salem Pointe Capital, LLC. (Swartwood, Garrett)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/07/2018. (KMK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BEP Rarity Bay, LLC, Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC. Amendment to #7 Notice of Appearance . (Baxter, John)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thompson Baxter on behalf of BEP Rarity Bay, LLC, Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC (Baxter, John)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/18/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Salem Pointe Capital, LLC by Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC, BEP Rarity Bay, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Plan Development, #2 Exhibit B - CCR Phases 1 - V, #3 Exhibit C - Development Standards for the Tellico Project, #4 Exhibit D - Sample Deed with Supplemental Restrictions, #5 Exhibit E - Bylaws for RBCAI Phase VI, #6 Exhibit F - Golf Membership Plan, #7 Exhibit G - Memorandum Opinion and Order, #8 Exhibit H - Sixth Amendment, #9 Exhibit I - Seventh Amendment, #10 Exhibit J -Minutes from November 24, 2015 Board Meeting, #11 Exhibit K - Settlement Agreement)(Ramsey, Shane)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/11/18. (KFB, )
October 10, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KFB, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Chancery Court, case number 20,430. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3790369), filed by Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC, BEP Rarity Bay, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit B - State Court File, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ramsey, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salem Pointe Capital, LLC v. BEP Rarity Bay, LLC et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEP Rarity Bay, LLC
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Shane G Ramsey
Represented By: John Thompson Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Pointe Capital, LLC
Represented By: Garrett P Swartwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?