Phillips v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Hattie E. Phillips
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00478
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SSA Office of General Counsel, Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (MDG)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, orthe plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s)as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of serviceshall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiffwill bear their own costs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/14/2018. (MDG)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
November 8, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3813789.) filed by Hattie E. Phillips . (AMP)
November 8, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3813789.) by Hattie E. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa) Modified on 11/8/2018 to reflect certificate of good standing is over 30 days, but the attorney's good standing has been confirmed. (AMP).
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hattie E. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, Melissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Hattie E. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie E. Phillips
Represented By: Melissa A Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?