Bailey v. Merlyn Funding, LLC (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Joshua R. Bailey
Defendant: Merlyn Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00481
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Joshua R. Bailey (Philipps, David)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The plaintiff reported this case settled in a December 10, 2018 Notice of Settlement. [Doc. 7]. The parties shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/11/2018. (CAT)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Joshua R. Bailey Case Reported Settled By David J. Philipps; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Philipps, David)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/18. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Merlyn Funding, LLC. (JBR)
November 13, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Joshua R. Bailey (Philipps, Mary)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merlyn Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3815342.), filed by Joshua R. Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Other Disclosure Statement)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Merlyn Funding, LLC (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua R. Bailey
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Represented By: David J Philipps
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Ellis Banks
Represented By: Cynthia T Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlyn Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?