Rogers et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,

Plaintiff: Carolyn Susie Rogers and George Rogers
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 3:2018cv00487
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by George A Rowlett (Rowlett, George)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/19/2018. (SAC, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kern, Elle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Kern, Elle) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/18/2018 with flattened .pdf) (AYB).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/27/2018. (MRE, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.(Kern, Elle)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/16/2018. (JCK)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/16/2018. (JCK)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/16/2018. (JCK)
November 16, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JCK)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Kern, Elle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 3-359-18. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3818639), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kern, Elle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Susie Rogers
Represented By: P Richard Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rogers
Represented By: P Richard Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?