Brown v. LVNV Funding, LLC (JRG1)

Plaintiff: Keelin Brown
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00490
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff SHALL file an amended Complaint consisted with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8 on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/14/18. (c/m to Keelin Brown, 1615 McCroskey Ave., Knoxville, TN 37917) (ABF)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/18. (c/m to Keelin Brown, 1615 McCroskey Ave., Knoxville, TN 37917) (ABF)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/18. (c/m to Keelin Brown, 1615 McCroskey Ave., Knoxville, TN 37917) (ABF)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/20/18. (c/m to Keelin Brown, 1615 McCroskey Ave., Knoxville, TN 37917) (ABF)
November 19, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC. (Walter, Glenn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Walter, Glenn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Walter, Glenn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 [WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED; REFILED AS #6 ] Certificate of Corporate Interest by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Originator, LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC. (Walter, Glenn) Modified on 11/20/2018 (ABF).
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by LVNV Funding, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Walter, Glenn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County General Sessions, case number 650K. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3821590), filed by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal from Knox Sessions)(Walter, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. LVNV Funding, LLC (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Glenn R Walter
Represented By: Manuel H Newburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keelin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?