Adamson v. Exedy America Corporation

Plaintiff: John Adamson
Defendant: Exedy America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00515
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Exedy America Corporation (Jackson, Howard)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, Howard)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/24/2019. (MRE, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Exedy America Corporation.(Jackson, Howard)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Exedy America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Exedy Holdings of America, Inc., Corporate Parent AISIN Holdings of America for Exedy America Corporation. (Jackson, Howard)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Answer by Exedy America Corporation. (Jackson, Howard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Exedy America Corporation. (CNC, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/18. (CNC, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/18. (CNC, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/18. (CNC, )
December 5, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CNC, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exedy America Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3832668.), filed by John Adamson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Simmons, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. Exedy America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedy America Corporation
Represented By: Howard B Jackson
Represented By: Ann E Sartwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Adamson
Represented By: Austin Ryan Simmons
Represented By: Jonathan A Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?