Scott v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Sherrie Scott
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00522
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Case transferred from Tennessee Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-00296, filed 01/18/2019. (KMK, )
January 16, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern California. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ABF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSER ORDER (CTO-116) transferring case to the MDL Panel. (ABF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-116) (ABF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ABF)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sherrie Scott Summons (re-filed) (Lewis, Russell)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/13/18. (JBR)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/13/18. (JBR)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/13/18. (JBR)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Russell Lewis, IV: Summons not completed. Please fill out attorney name and address section on the Summons and re-file using the "Notice (Other)" event. Requirements due by 12/18/2018. (JBR)
December 13, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff Sherrie Scott against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3837968.), filed by Sherrie Scott. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lewis, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Scott
Represented By: Russell W Lewis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?