Wilson v. Stewart, et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lucas Wilson
Defendant: Officer Stewart, Forrest L Wallace and Officer Alan Stewart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00015
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Compel. Although Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, he still must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Rules of this Court. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery [Id.] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/7/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Ronnie Lucas Wilson)(JCK)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. (JBR, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. After considering the relevant factors, the Court finds that appointment of counsel is not warranted at this time, as no exceptional circumstances exist. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel [Id.] is DENIED.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Ronnie Lucas Wilson)(JCK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Officer Alan Stewart. (Summons and copy of Complaint and Amended Complaint forwarded to USMS) (JBR) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (JBR).
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. (JBR)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 5] is GRANTED; Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee; The custodian of Plaintiffs inmate trust account at the institution where he now resides is DIRECTED to submit payments toward the filing fee to the Clerk in the manner set forth above; The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this memorandum and order to the Sheriff of Knox County and the Court's financial deputy; Defendant Wallace is DISMISSED; The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for Defendant Stewart; Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/15/2019. (Copy of Memorandum and blank service packet mailed to Ronnie Lucas Wilson, Copy of Memorandum mailed to the Sheriff of Knox County, Copy of Memorandum emailed via NEF to court's financial deputy) (JCK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT/Certificate of Inmate Trust Account to #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. (JBR)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that if he fails to fully timely comply with this order, the Court shall presume that Plaintiff is not a pauper, shall assess the full amount of fees, and shall order the case dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/10/2019. (Copy of order mailed to Ronnie Lucas Wilson)(JCK)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stewart, Forrest L Wallace., filed by Ronnie Lucas Wilson.(JBR)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. (JBR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Mailed Complaint form, IFP form and Certificate of Inmate Account form to Plaintiff) (JBR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (JBR)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 [DISREGARD ENTRY. ERROR WHILE DOCKETING] NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Mailed Complaint forms, IFP forms and Certificate of Inmate Account form to Plaintiff) (JBR) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (JBR).
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stewart, filed by Ronnie Lucas Wilson. (No filing fee nor IFP received) (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest L Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Lucas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?