Morgan County, Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma LP et al (TV1)

Plaintiff: Morgan County, Tennessee
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, David A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Kathe A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler and Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Case Number: 3:2019cv00036
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
2 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Case transferred from Tennessee Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45075, filed 02/15/2019. (KMK, )
February 14, 2019 Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. (JBR, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of MDL Transfer Order (JBR, )
February 8, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3886343.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, )
February 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral. The Clerk's Office was able to verify her admission status with New York and California. Her name is spelled slightly different between databases. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Paulina do Amaral's office contacted the Clerk's Office on 2/07/2019 re: #10 PHV Motion and #13 Notice of Deficiency. Counsel is in the process of requesting/receiving certificates of good standing from New York and California. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3886343.) by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other Certificate of Service)(Byrd, Kenneth)
February 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885679.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, )
February 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885676.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885666.) : The Clerks Office has been unable to confirm your good standing in the following state(s). Accordingly, a certificate(s) of good standing must be submitted: New York and California. (JBR, ) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Paulina do Amaral on 2/7/2019 (JBR, ).
February 7, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885637.) filed by Morgan County, Tennessee (JBR, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce W. Leppla ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885679.) by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other Certificate of Service)(Byrd, Kenneth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven E. Fineman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885676.) by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other Certificate of Service)(Byrd, Kenneth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paulina do Amaral ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885666.) by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other Certificate of Service)(Byrd, Kenneth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth J. Cabraser ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3885637.) by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Other Certificate of Service)(Byrd, Kenneth)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge R Leon Jordan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/28/19. (JBR)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 1/25/19. (JBR)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Morgan County, Tennessee.(Byrd, Kenneth)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman) (CAT)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman (CAT)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 01/23/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Bruce Leppla, Elizabeth Cabraser, John Spragens, Paulina do Amaral, Steven Fineman) (CAT)
January 23, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (CAT)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys John Spragens, Elizabeth Cabraser, Bruce Leppla, Steven Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral are not admitted (see LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to John Spragens, Elizabeth Cabraser, Bruce Leppla, Steven Fineman, and Paulina do Amaral) (CAT)
January 23, 2019 District Judge R Leon Jordan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3870944.), filed by Morgan County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrd, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan County, Tennessee v. Purdue Pharma LP et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan County, Tennessee
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: Steven E Fineman
Represented By: Paulina do Amaral
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: Jonathan Swann Taylor
Represented By: Elizabeth J Cabraser
Represented By: Kenneth S. Byrd
Represented By: Bruce W Leppla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?