Adair et al v. Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Laymon Wilson, Fereny Zuluaga, Lorrell Plater, Daisy Baltimore, Jeffrey Laxa, Kimberly Ryckebosch, Joanne Macalino, Wendy Wilson, Teofilo Deloyola, Phillip Alvey, Marc Lucas, John Denten, Kerri Aitken, Justine Smalley, Debbie Adair, Heide Demorris, Janice Alvey, Anderson Hamilton, Elliott Smalley, Kimberly Wallace, Adam Jones, Allen Starks, Phillip Campagna, Tameka Starks, Morris Plater, Joshua Bunn, Alison Lentz McAlister, Arlyse Deloyola, Jeffrey McAlister, Justin Baltimore, Chelcie Callanta, Sabrina Hamilton, Peter Ryckebosch, Diana Zink Denten and Deeann Jones
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. and BPS Direct, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00054
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tim Eisenhour)(Bundren, Russell)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against All Defendants., filed by Tameka Starks, Allen Starks, Kimberly Wallace, Chelcie Callanta, Morris Plater, Adam Jones, Phillip Alvey, Debbie Adair, Jeffrey Laxa, Justine Smalley, Deeann Jones, Lorrell Plater, Alison Lentz McAlister, Peter Ryckebosch, Marc Lucas, Sabrina Hamilton, Jeffrey McAlister, Arlyse Deloyola, Elliott Smalley, Wendy Wilson, Teofilo Deloyola, Joanne Macalino, Diana Zink Denten, Fereny Zuluaga, Kimberly Ryckebosch, Joshua Bunn, Janice Alvey, Heide Demorris, John Denten, Anderson Hamilton, Phillip Campagna, Justin Baltimore, Laymon Wilson, Kerri Aitken, Daisy Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Facts)(Stewart, Jessica)
March 26, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants., filed by Tameka Starks, Allen Starks, Kimberly Wallace, Chelcie Callanta, Morris Plater, Adam Jones, Phillip Alvey, Debbie Adair, Jeffrey Laxa, Justine Smalley, Deeann Jones, Lorrell Plater, Alison Lentz McAlister, Peter Ryckebosch, Marc Lucas, Sabrina Hamilton, Jeffrey McAlister, Arlyse Deloyola, Elliott Smalley, Wendy Wilson, Teofilo Deloyola, Joanne Macalino, Diana Zink Denten, Fereny Zuluaga, Kimberly Ryckebosch, Joshua Bunn, Janice Alvey, Heide Demorris, John Denten, Anderson Hamilton, Phillip Campagna, Justin Baltimore, Laymon Wilson, Kerri Aitken, Daisy Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Facts)(Stewart, Jessica)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand [Doc. 20] is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by April 9, 2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/25/2019. (BDG, )
March 24, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Alan C Lee terminated. (Lee, Alan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Remand by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Bundren, Russell)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/21/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 3/21/2019 to note c/m Jessica Stewart The Abrams Firm P.O. Box 31242 Knoxville, TN 37930 (ADA).
March 18, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica Stewart. Verified that Jessica Stewart is pending admission and has submitted the required documentation and fee. (ADA)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica Stewart by Debbie Adair, Kerri Aitken, Janice Alvey, Phillip Alvey. (Lee, Alan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lee, Alan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Debbie Adair, Kerri Aitken, Janice Alvey, Phillip Alvey. (Lee, Alan)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/7/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Andrea Nathan and Grace Mead on 3/8/2019 (JBR, ).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs anticipated amended pleading within fourteen (14) days of its filing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). If Plaintiffs do not amend their Amended Complaint by March 26, 2019, Defendants shall file response to the operative pleading no later than April 2, 2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/4/2019. (BJL, ) Modified on 3/4/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorneys Andrea Nathan, Grace Lee Mead and Jessica Stewart .
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint [Doc. 1-2] by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Bundren, Russell)
March 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Grace L. Mead for Defendants ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3905153.) filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., BPS Direct, LLC, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrea N. Nathan for Defendants ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3905136.) filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., BPS Direct, LLC (JBR, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Grace L. Mead for Defendants ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3905153.) by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Southern District of Florida)(Bundren, Russell)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrea N. Nathan for Defendants ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3905136.) by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Southern District of Florida)(Bundren, Russell)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #8 Amended Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by March 5, 2019. Defendants should stay cognizant of the Courts order requiring conferral prior to filing motions to dismiss [See Doc #6 ].Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/19/2019. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Jessica Stewart
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Travis R McDonough no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/19/19. (copy mailed to Jessica Stewart) (JBR, ) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (JBR, ).
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Doc. 1-2] by BPS Direct, LLC, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence to counsel for Plaintiffs from counsel for Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence to counsel for Defendants from counsel for Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence to counsel for Plaintiffs from counsel for Defendants)(Bundren, Russell)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/14/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Jessica Stewart.
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/14/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Jessica Stewart.
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/14/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney Jessica Stewart.
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Jessica Stewart. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney Jessica Stewart.
February 13, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George H Cate, III on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Cate, George)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bluegreen Vacations Corporation for Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Bundren, Russell)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Chancery Court, case number 19-1-003. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3891704), filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Bundren, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair et al v. Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laymon Wilson
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fereny Zuluaga
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrell Plater
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Baltimore
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Laxa
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ryckebosch
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Macalino
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Wilson
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teofilo Deloyola
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Alvey
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Lucas
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Denten
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Aitken
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Smalley
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Adair
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heide Demorris
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Alvey
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anderson Hamilton
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Smalley
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wallace
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Jones
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Starks
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Campagna
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Starks
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Plater
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bunn
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Lentz McAlister
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlyse Deloyola
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McAlister
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Baltimore
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelcie Callanta
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Hamilton
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Ryckebosch
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Zink Denten
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deeann Jones
Represented By: Jessica Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Russell Brandon Bundren
Represented By: George H Cate, III
Represented By: Grace Lee Mead
Represented By: Andrea Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS Direct, LLC
Represented By: George H Cate, III
Represented By: Russell Brandon Bundren
Represented By: Grace Lee Mead
Represented By: Andrea Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?