Rogers v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Plaintiff: Katherine Sue Rogers
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/2/2019. (BDG, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Kern, Elle)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Katherine Sue Rogers Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant (Smith, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L. Collier on 3/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.(Kern, Elle)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George A Rowlett on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (Rowlett, George)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine Sue Rogers. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, served on 2/19/2019. (Smith, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tony Sax is RELIEVED of his duties as counsel in this matter, and Attorneys Bryan Capps, Stephen Burroughs, and Michael Smith will remain as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 2/22/19. (JBR, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Tony L. Smith, Esq., only by Katherine Sue Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Other Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Tony L. Sax) (AMP)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Tony L. Sax) (AMP)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 02/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Tony L. Sax) (AMP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (AMP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Tony L. Sax is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Tony L. Sax) (AMP)
February 14, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WalMart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3892929.), filed by Katherine Sue Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Sue Rogers
Represented By: Michael T Smith
Represented By: Bryan L Capps
Represented By: Stephen A Burroughs
Represented By: Tony L Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?