Penda Corporation et al v. Formall, Inc. (RLJ2)
Plaintiff: The PendaForm Company, The Fabri-Form Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC and Penda Corporation
Defendant: Formall, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00059
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: R Leon Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Penda Corporation, The Fabri-Form Company, The PendaForm Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC of Filing of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate in 3:19-cv-00088)(Blue, William)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 3/7/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 3/8/2019 to note c/m to Gregory T Everts & Marisa L Berlinger of Quarles & Brady LLP(Madison) 33 East Main Street Suite 900 Madison, WI 53703 along with ECF info) (ADA).
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company, The Fabri-Form Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC. All Defendants. (Blue, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Penda Corporation, The Fabri-Form Company, The PendaForm Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC. (Blue, William)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/19/2019. Copy of Order mailed to Gregory T Everts and Marisa L Berlinger)(JCK)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/19/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Gregory T Everts and Marisa L Berlinger)(JCK)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 2/19/2019. Copy of Order mailed to Gregory T Everts and Marisa L Berlinger)(JCK)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Penda Corporation, The Fabri-Form Company, The PendaForm Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC. (JCK)
February 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marisa L. Berlinger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3894829.) filed by The Fabri-Form Company, Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company and #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory T. Everts ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3894828.) filed by The Fabri-Form Company, Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company as to Penda Corporation, The Fabri-Form Company, The PendaForm Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC (ADA)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marisa L. Berlinger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3894829.) by Penda Corporation, The Fabri-Form Company, The PendaForm Company, Trienda Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Blue, William) Modified on 2/19/2019 to note filing is an apparent duplicate of #4 (ADA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Formall, Inc.. (ADA)
February 19, 2019 Case transferred in from Southern Division on 02/19/2019 due to a docketing error. This case was initially filed as 1:19-cv-46, but it was styled for the Northern Division, all future pleadings should be filed in 3:19-CV-59.(JCK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons by The Fabri-Form Company, The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company. (Blue, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marisa L. Berlinger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3894829.) by The Fabri-Form Company, The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Blue, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory T. Everts ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3894828.) by The Fabri-Form Company, The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Blue, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by The Fabri-Form Company, The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company. (Blue, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Formall, Inc. against The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company, The Fabri-Form Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3894819.), filed by The Penda Corporation, The PendaForm Company, The Fabri-Form Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Compete, #2 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit Demand Letter)(Blue, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penda Corporation et al v. Formall, Inc. (RLJ2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The PendaForm Company
Represented By: Marisa L Berlinger
Represented By: Gregory T Everts
Represented By: William A Blue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fabri-Form Company
Represented By: Marisa L Berlinger
Represented By: Gregory T Everts
Represented By: William A Blue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trienda Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marisa L Berlinger
Represented By: Gregory T Everts
Represented By: William A Blue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penda Corporation
Represented By: Marisa L Berlinger
Represented By: Gregory T Everts
Represented By: William A Blue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?