Humphrey v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrence M. Humphrey
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 03/28/2019. (CAT)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, (de Quesada, Maria)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (de Quesada, Maria)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER for Release of Medical Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/22/19. (ABF)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER AND STIPULATION re #9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, is hereby substituted for Walmart, Inc. as the proper defendant in this action. It is further ORDERED that Walmart, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 03/20/2019. (CAT)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order for the Release of Plaintiff's Records)(de Quesada, Maria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order and Stipulation by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation)(de Quesada, Maria)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/27/2019. (CAT)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(de Quesada, Maria)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/21/19. (JBR, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/21/19. (JBR, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/21/19. (JBR, )
February 21, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (de Quesada, Maria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 1-27-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3897573), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Other Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(de Quesada, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: Maria T de Quesada
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence M. Humphrey
Represented By: Glen B Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?