Phillips v. Walmart, Inc. (TWP2)

Plaintiff: Ellen Phillips
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00069
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W. Phillips. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W. Phillips.Signed by District Judge Thomas W. Phillips on 4/1/19. (ADA)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Ellen Phillips Discovery Plan (Ward, Hugh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walmart, Inc..(Elliott, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Ellen Phillips.(Ward, Hugh)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Ellen Phillips (Ward, Hugh)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W. Phillips on 3/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Elliott, Stephen)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/28/2019. (CAT)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/28/2019. (CAT)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/28/2019. (CAT)
February 28, 2019 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (Elliott, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 2-31-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3904200), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Other Notice of filing Notice of Removal, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Elliott, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Walmart, Inc. (TWP2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen W Elliott
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Stephen W Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Phillips
Represented By: Hugh B Ward, Jr
Represented By: Mindy L Nower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?