Moore v. Knox County et al (TWP1)

Plaintiff: Ralph Moore
Defendant: Christian Gomez, Knox County, John/Jane Doe, J. J. Jones, John/Jane Doe(s) #4, Knox County, Tennessee, John/Jane Doe(s) #1, John/Jane Does, John/Jane Doe(s) #2, John/Jane Doe(s) #3 and James J.J. Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv00074
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Havasy, Houston)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Knox County, Tennessee (Havasy, Houston)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/1/19. (JBR, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W. Phillips on 3/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Knox County, Tennessee.(Havasy, Houston)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lynn Morse on behalf of Knox County, Tennessee (Morse, Amanda)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 3/5/19. (aws, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 3/5/19. (aws, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 3/5/19. (aws, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Houston Scott Havasy re #2 Supplement. (aws, )
March 5, 2019 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (aws, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by John/Jane Doe, Christian Gomez, J. J. Jones, Knox County of Compliance with 28 Section 1446(d) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Havasy, Houston)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Action Cover Sheet by John/Jane Doe, Christian Gomez, J. J. Jones, Knox County. (Havasy, Houston)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit, case number 2-55-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3907472), filed by Knox County, John/Jane Doe, Christian Gomez, J. J. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Havasy, Houston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Knox County et al (TWP1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Gomez
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. J. Jones
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s) #4
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, Tennessee
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Represented By: Amanda Lynn Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s) #1
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s) #2
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe(s) #3
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J.J. Jones
Represented By: Houston Scott Havasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Moore
Represented By: Ursula Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?