Clark et al v. Piedmont Airlines (TV1)

Plaintiff: Williams Clark and Tofuola J. Clark
Defendant: Piedmont Airlines
Case Number: 3:2019cv00075
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Piedmont Airlines (Fonnesbeck, Shana)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fonnesbeck, Shana)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/16/19. (JBR, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Piedmont Airlines.(Fonnesbeck, Shana)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/5/2019. (BDG, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/5/2019. (BDG, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/5/2019. (BDG, )
March 5, 2019 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BDG, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Piedmont Airlines. (Robinson, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Blount County, Tennessee, case number L-20100. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3907635), filed by Piedmont Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Michelle Foose, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Piedmont Airlines (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams Clark
Represented By: George T Underwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tofuola J. Clark
Represented By: George T Underwood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Airlines
Represented By: Jennifer Bergstrom Robinson
Represented By: Shana G Fonnesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?