Hawk v. U.S. Xpress, Inc. et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Jerry C Hawk
Defendant: U.S. Xpress, Inc., U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc, U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc., Craig Wilks and Dollar General Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00164
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service for Docs. [15-19] by Jerry C Hawk (Pantazis, Evan) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (JBR).
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry C Hawk. U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc served on 5/21/2019. (Pantazis, Evan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry C Hawk. U.S. Xpress, Inc. served on 5/21/2019. (Pantazis, Evan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry C Hawk. Dollar General Corporation served on 5/20/2019. (Pantazis, Evan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry C Hawk. U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc. served on 5/20/2019. (Pantazis, Evan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry C Hawk. Craig Wilks served on 5/20/2019. (Pantazis, Evan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 5/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Evan Pantazis and Patrick Pantazis on 5/24/2019 (JBR).
May 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan D. Pantazis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978210.) filed by Jerry C Hawk, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick L. Pantazis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978213.) filed by Jerry C Hawk (JBR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick L. Pantazis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978213.) by Jerry C Hawk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilreath, R.)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Evan D. Pantazis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3978210.) by Jerry C Hawk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilreath, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc, #2 Summons U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc., #3 Summons Dollar General Corporation, #4 Summons Craig Wilks) (JBR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jerry C Hawk of summons to be issued on Defendant Dollar General Corporation (Gilreath, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jerry C Hawk of summons to be issued on Defendant U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc. (Gilreath, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jerry C Hawk of summons to be issued on Defendant U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc. (Gilreath, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jerry C Hawk of summons to be issued on Defendant U.S. Xpress, Inc. (Gilreath, R.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jerry C Hawk of summons to be issued on Defendant Craig Wilks (Gilreath, R.)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/19. Serviced via US Mail to attorneys Evan and Patrick Pantazis. (KFB)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/29. Serviced via US Mail to attorneys Evan and Patrick Pantazis. (KFB)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/19. Serviced via US Mail to attorneys Evan and Patrick Pantazis. (KFB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to attorneys Evan D. Pantazis and Patrick Pantazis. This noticed serviced via US Mail to Evan Pantazis and Patrick Pantazis. (KFB)
May 8, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (KFB)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3967838.), filed by Jerry C Hawk. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilreath, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk v. U.S. Xpress, Inc. et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry C Hawk
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Represented By: Patrick Pantazis
Represented By: Evan D Pantazis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?