Cox v. Orta, et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Brent Edward Cox
Defendant: Tom Spangler, Knoxville Police Department, Geraldo Orta, Eve M Thomas, Jimmy Jones, John Does, Knox County Sheriff's Office, David Rausch, Knox County and City of Knoxville
Case Number: 3:2019cv00165
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Knox County. (Wigler, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M Prince on behalf of Geraldo Orta(Individually ) (Prince, Gary)
June 8, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Knoxville, John Does, Knox County, Geraldo Orta(Individually ), Geraldo Orta(In his official capacity as a Knoxville Police Department Officer)., filed by Brent Edward Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amble et al v. Spangler et al)(Evans, Nathaniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brent Edward Cox. Knox County served on 5/21/2019. (Evans, Nathaniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brent Edward Cox. City of Knoxville served on 5/21/2019. (Evans, Nathaniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brent Edward Cox. Geraldo Orta(Individually ) served on 5/15/2019. (Evans, Nathaniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Wigler on behalf of Knox County (Wigler, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3975574.): A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. (JBR)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3975574.) by Brent Edward Cox. (Evans, Nathaniel)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/19. (AWS) Mailed to Mitchell Harper.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/19. (AWS) Mailed to Mitchell Harper.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/19. (AWS) Mailed to Mitchell Harper.
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Thomas, #2 Summons Spangler, #3 Summons Rausch, #4 Summons Jones, #5 Summons Knoxville Police Department, #6 Summons City of Knoxville, #7 Summons Knox Co. Sheriff's Office, #8 Summons Knox County, #9 Summons Johns Does)(AWS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Nathaniel Harold Evans re #1 Complaint. (AWS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Mitchell T. Harper. PHV Requirements Deadline: 5/28/2019. (AWS) Mailed to Mitchell Harper.
May 9, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brent Edward Cox ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3967850.), filed by Brent Edward Cox. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Evans, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Orta, et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Edward Cox
Represented By: Nathaniel Harold Evans
Represented By: Mitchell T Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoxville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldo Orta
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Knoxville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?