Pritchard v. Smith
Plaintiff: Clinton Lee Pritchard
Defendant: Fred Smith, Leanne Sheppard and Lindy Fagen Houston
Case Number: 3:2019cv00167
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge (copy mailed to Clinton Lee Pritchard #485740, MCCX, PO Box 2000, Wartburg, TN 37887) (AYB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fred Smith.(Lorch, Pamela)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fred Smith. (original and one copy of summons, USM-285 and copy of Complaint forwarded to USMS) (JBR)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/22/19. (copy mailed to Clinton Pritchard at Morgan County along with service packet, custodian of inmate accounts and TN Attorney General; copy forwarded to Court's Financial Deputy) (JBR)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clinton Lee Pritchard. (JBR, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clinton Lee Pritchard. (JBR, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clinton Lee Pritchard. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Letter & Envelope)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Smith
Represented By: Pamela S Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindy Fagen Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Lee Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?