Cline v. JJ's Transportation, LLC et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Alexis Cline
Defendant: JJ's Transportation, LLC, Jonathon Alan Gray, John Doe, State of Tennessee and GEICO
Case Number: 3:2019cv00169
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Alexis Cline. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Ellis, Danny)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GEICO, Jonathon Alan Gray, JJ's Transportation, LLC, and State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Jonathon Alan Gray, #2 Summons for GEICO, #3 Summons for State of Tennessee) (AYB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons to be issued to Defendant JJ's Transportation by Alexis Cline. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Defendant Gray, #2 Summons to unnamed Defendant GEICO, #3 Summons to unnamed Defendant State of Tennessee)(Ellis, Danny)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/13/2019. (CAT)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/13/2019. (CAT)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 05/13/2019. (CAT)
May 13, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (CAT)
May 13, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathon Alan Gray, JJ's Transportation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3969593.), filed by Alexis Cline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Danny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. JJ's Transportation, LLC et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ's Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Alan Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Cline
Represented By: Danny R Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?