Jenkins v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (TV2)
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jenkins
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00171
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Jeffrey Jenkins (Bell, James)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/26/19. (ABF)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jeffrey Jenkins Notice of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Bell, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Apperson, Ricky)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Apperson, Ricky)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (JBR)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (JBR)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/19. (JBR)
May 13, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Apperson, Ricky)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 3-134-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3969808), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Apperson, Ricky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Ricky Lynn Apperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jenkins
Represented By: Chelsea Alicia Harris
Represented By: Jacob Feuer
Represented By: James A Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?