Foust v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC

Plaintiff: Clarence Foust
Defendant: Comast Cable Communications, LLC and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00173
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC Leave of Absence (Johnson, William)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Tracfone Wireless on 05132019 (Miller, Ben)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 5/24/2019 to indicate c/m to Sean G Wieber (ABF).
May 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean G. Wieber ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3979722.) filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC (ABF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean G. Wieber ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3979722.) by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Gillis, Donald)
May 15, 2019 Attorney Gillis to disregard Notice #2 , Court ECF database updated as to Attorney Gillis admitted to EDTN in 2018. (SAC)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #6 Motion to Stay. Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint no later than July 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/15/2019. (AML)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Gillis, Donald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Stay Initial Case Deadlines by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Pierce, Charles)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/13/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Wieber.
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC)Notice mailed to Wieber. Modified on 5/15/2019, disregard Notice for Gillis. Attorney ECF database updated as to Gillis being admitted to EDTN in 2018. (SAC).
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (SAC)
May 13, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 310319. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3970643), filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Initial Discovery, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal)(Pierce, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foust v. Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Sean G Wieber
Represented By: Donald Austin Gillis
Represented By: Charles E Pierce
Represented By: William R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Sean G Wieber
Represented By: Charles E Pierce
Represented By: William R Johnson
Represented By: Donald Austin Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Foust
Represented By: Ben Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?