Wieand et al v. Salley

Plaintiff: Enrique Orejuela and Amelia Wieand
Defendant: Jennifer Salley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Lindsay Ivey on 7/8/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Brandi Aaron on 7/3/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brandi Aaron and Lindsay Ivey by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Chelsea Barger on 6/28/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Jason Boring on 6/28/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Vanessa Nieves on 7/2/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Veronica Nieves on 7/2/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Allison Streeter on 6/29/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Maryanne Murphy on 6/29/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Ryan Burroughs on 6/29/19 (Warchol, Samantha)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF AMELIA WIEAND AND ENRIQUE OREJUELA'S RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Stovall, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Veronica Nieves by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vanessa Nieves by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ryan Burroughs by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maryanne Murphy by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Boring by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Allison Streeter by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chelsea Barger by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Warchol, Samantha)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jennifer Salley.(Foster, Leslie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Foster, Leslie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOC #17 *** REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Foster, Leslie) Modified on 6/19/2019 (BDG).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #8 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/14/19. (JBR)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019, at 01:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 6/14/2019. (CMH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of 14 Day Extension by Jennifer Salley. (Foster, Leslie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie T Foster on behalf of Jennifer Salley (Foster, Leslie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2019. The Court held a telephone conference in this matter to obtain more information regarding the Stipulation [Doc. 10], filed on June 7, 2019, and to inquire of Mr. Hedrick regarding his limited appearance. Attorney Hedrick confirmed that he had only entered a limited appearance. (RLK)
June 11, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2019 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. The Court will initiate the call. (RLK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand. (Ritchie, Wayne)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the Court will hold Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Early Discovery [Doc. #8 ] in ABEYANCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/6/19. (JBR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Expedite Early Discovery by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Re. Expedited Motion for Early Discovery)(Warchol, Samantha)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand. (Stovall, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Refiled as doc. {7} SUMMONS Returned Executed by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand. Jennifer Salley served on 5/13/2019. (Stovall, James) Modified on 5/14/2019 2nd page was incorrectly filled out. (JAN).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/13/19. (GRE)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/13/19. (GRE)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/13/19. (GRE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Salley. (GRE)
May 13, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (GRE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Salley ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3970662.), filed by E. Ga. O., E. Gr. O.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued)(Stovall, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wieand et al v. Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Orejuela
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Wieand
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Salley
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Joshua D Hedrick
Represented By: Joseph R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?