Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC v. King Distilling Co. LLC (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC
Defendant: King Distilling Co. LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to King Distilling Co. LLC by Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Other Proposed Entry of Default)(Googe, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC. All Defendants. (Googe, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 4069788, 5141616, 5087832, 5501671, 5501669, 4069789, 5029462, 5111844, 5745967, 5141733, 4096942, 4088878, 4092396, 4106507, 4180903, 4580363 . (Googe, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/16/2019. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/16/2019. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 05/16/2019. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to King Distilling Co. LLC. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: Please refile the Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark using the event Patent and Trademark Notice under Other Documents. Requirements due by 5/21/2019. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ole Smoky HoldCo, LLC for Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC. (Googe, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3974148.), filed by Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Other Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Googe, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC v. King Distilling Co. LLC (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Distilling Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ole Smoky Distillery, LLC
Represented By: Michael E Robinson
Represented By: Matthew M Googe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?