Mikey Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Mikey Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00192
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mikey Enterprises, Inc.. Owners Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/29/2019. (McWherter, J)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on May 30, 2019. (AYB)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on May 30, 2019. (AYB)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on May 30, 2019. (AYB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Owners Insurance Company. (AYB)
May 29, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L Bobbitt on behalf of Mikey Enterprises, Inc. (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton H. Scott on behalf of Mikey Enterprises, Inc. (Scott, Clinton)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3984563.), filed by Mikey Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Policy, #2 Exhibit B. Assignment of Claim, #3 Exhibit C. Tolling Agreement, #4 Exhibit D. Tolling Agreement Addendum, #5 Exhibit E. Owners letter to Plaintiff (5/8/2019), #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(McWherter, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikey Enterprises, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikey Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: J Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L Bobbitt
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?