Melancon et al v. Weitzel et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Sherry J Melancon and Carlyle J Melancon
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, Inclusive and Kenneth Weitzel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00194
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 State Remand Letter. (copy mailed to Kenneth Weitzel, copy mailed to Loudon County General Sessions Court along with certified copy of docket sheet and certified copy of Doc. #12 Order) (JBR) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (JBR).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS in whole the R&R [Doc. #5 ] pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Mr. Weitzel's Notice of Removal [Doc. #1 ] is hereby DISMISSED and this case is REMANDED to the Loudon County General Sessions Court. The Court additionally notes that plaintiffs have recently filed a Motion to Remand [Doc. #10 ], which this Court DENIES as moot, given our acceptance of the R&R. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/1/19. (copy mailed to Kenneth Weitzel) (JBR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations filed by Kenneth Weitzel. (ABF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carlyle J Melancon, Sherry J Melancon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Dickenson, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel Thomas Dickenson re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : The document attached to the Motion to Remand is actually the memorandum in support. Please refile both the Motion and the memorandum in support of remand. Requirements due by 7/1/2019. (ABF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Carlyle J Melancon, Sherry J Melancon. (Dickenson, Thomas) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (ABF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 [Wrong document attached; refiled as #10 ] MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carlyle J Melancon, Sherry J Melancon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Dickenson, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2019 (ABF).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kenneth Weitzel. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Notice of Removal in this case without prepayment of costs or fees. The Clerk SHALL NOT issue process, however, at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/12/19. (copy mailed to Kenneth Weitzel) (JBR) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (JBR). Modified text on 6/18/2019 (JBR).
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service of Document by Kenneth Weitzel (JBR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Kenneth Weitzel) (JBR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties by Kenneth Weitzel (JBR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Weitzel. (JBR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Loudon County General Sessions Court, case number 2019-cv-681, filed by Kenneth Weitzel. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melancon et al v. Weitzel et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry J Melancon
Represented By: Thomas H Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlyle J Melancon
Represented By: Thomas H Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Weitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?