Roane County, Tennessee et al v. The Tennessee Valley Authority et al (TV3)
Plaintiff: City of Harriman, Tennessee, Kingston, TN, Roane County, Tennessee, The City of Harriman, Tennessee and The City of Kingston, Tennessee
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Tennessee Valley Authority and The Tennessee Valley Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv00206
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Roane County, Tennessee, The City of Harriman, Tennessee, The City of Kingston, Tennessee (Stewart, Keith)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 07/19/2019. (JTS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form.(This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.)Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/19/2019. (JTS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 07/19/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (JTS)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Accordingly, plaintiffs shall have until August 12, 2019, to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss, and defendants shall have until September 9, 2019, to file a reply if they so choose. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/12/19. (JBR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), #20 MOTION to Dismiss by Roane County, Tennessee, The City of Harriman, Tennessee, The City of Kingston, Tennessee. (Stewart, Keith)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing EXHIBITS Q & R to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-Roane County Natural Hazard Mitigation Plan) (Tarwater, Dwight) Modified on 6/24/2019 to create docket relationship to MOTION (AYB).
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. re REQUEST for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-Knoxville News Sentinel articles list, #2 Exhibit D-RCC Minutes 01.2011, #3 Exhibit E-RCC Minutes 09.2013, #4 Exhibit F-RCC Minutes 05.2015, #5 Exhibit G-RCC Minutes 11.2011, #6 Exhibit H-RCC Minutes 11.2015, #7 Exhibit I-Adkisson Doc. 1, #8 Exhibit J-EPA Completion Report, #9 Exhibit K-KNS Fowler 6.5.2015, #10 Exhibit L-KNS Fowler 3.23.2015, #11 Exhibit M-KNS Lakin 12.31.2008, #12 Exhibit N-KNS Flory 12.31.2008, #13 Exhibit O-Adkisson Doc. 412, #14 Exhibit P-Chesney Doc. 1)(Tarwater, Dwight) Modified on 6/24/2019 to create docket relationship to MOTION (AYB).
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing EX B PART 1 to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. re #20 REQUEST for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss (Tarwater, Dwight) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (AYB).
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss re #20 (Attachments: #1 Other Smith Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-EPA AOC)(Tarwater, Dwight) Modified text and created docket relationship to motion on 6/24/2019 (AYB).
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by The Tennessee Valley Authority. (Koho, Frances)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by The Tennessee Valley Authority. (Koho, Frances)
June 21, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Bern ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999705.) filed by The City of Harriman, Tennessee, Roane County, Tennessee, The City of Kingston, Tennessee. A certificate of good standing was received on 6/21/2019. (KMK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Bern. Certificate of Good Standing from the Southern District of New York. (KMK)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/20/19. (JBR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Marc Bern re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Bern ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999705.): A certificate of good standing from another district court must be submitted. (JBR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc J. Bern ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3999705.) by Roane County, Tennessee, The City of Harriman, Tennessee, The City of Kingston, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Bern NY COGS)(Roper, John)
June 14, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy S. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997327.) filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theane Evangelis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997350.) filed by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (JBR)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theane Evangelis ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997350.) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Tarwater, Dwight)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy S. Smith ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3997327.) by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Tarwater, Dwight)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT and Joinder in Removal by Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. (Tarwater, Dwight)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/10/19. (JBR)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [Duplicate Order entered in error] Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/10/19. (JBR) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (JBR).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/10/19. (JBR)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Blanchard v. TVA, No. 3:09-CV-09. Related cases: Create association to 3:09-cv-00009-TAV-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 6/10/19. (JBR)
June 10, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Chase on behalf of The Tennessee Valley Authority (Chase, James)
June 7, 2019 Case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Guyton for related case determination. (JCK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorney Marc J. Bern is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (Copy of Notice mailed to Marc J. Bern) (JCK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (), filed by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Filing, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernier, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roane County, Tennessee et al v. The Tennessee Valley Authority et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Harriman, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingston, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roane County, Tennessee
Represented By: Marc Bern
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: John Tyler Roper
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Harriman, Tennessee
Represented By: Marc Bern
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: John Tyler Roper
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Kingston, Tennessee
Represented By: Marc Bern
Represented By: James K Scott
Represented By: John Tyler Roper
Represented By: Keith D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Jeremy S Smith
Represented By: Catherine Williams Anglin
Represented By: Dwight E Tarwater
Represented By: Thomas Howard Jarvis
Represented By: Barbara K Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: Michael Vincent Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: Michael Vincent Bernier
Represented By: Mark Alan Mohr
Represented By: David D Ayliffe
Represented By: Frances Regina Koho
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?