Saffell v. Knox County, TN et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Neal Saffell
Defendant: Knox County, TN, Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office and Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety
Case Number: 3:2019cv00210
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter is due to be REMANDED back to the Circuit Court for Knox County, Tennessee. See 11 U.S.C. 1447(c) (If at any time before final judgment it appears that the district court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the case shall be remanded.). The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to transfer the file to the Circuit Court Clerk for Knox County, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/26/19. (AWS) Mailed certified copy to Circuit Court for Knox County, Tennessee.
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before July 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 6/25/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to file responsive pleadings or motions by Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety, Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office, Knox County, TN. (Wigler, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety, Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office, Knox County, TN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court File)(Wigler, David)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/11/19. (ABF)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/11/19. (ABF)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/11/19. (ABF)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel David Wigler re: #1 Notice of Removal : Requirements due by 6/17/2019. Please file the state court documents as a supplement to the Notice of Removal(ABF)
June 10, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety, Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office, Knox County, TN re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Wigler, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit, case number 2-187-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3994162), filed by Knox County, TN, Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety, Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office.(Wigler, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saffell v. Knox County, TN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County, TN
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Sheriff Dept. Office
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knox County Deputy Corporate Surety
Represented By: David S Wigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Neal Saffell
Represented By: Ursula Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?