Yates et al v. Lott et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Yates, Casey Yates, Casey A Yates and Andrew C Yates
Defendant: Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc., Ronald Lott and Ronald George Lott
Case Number: 3:2019cv00228
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc., Ronald George Lott (Wolfe, Joshua)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 6/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc., Ronald George Lott.(Wolfe, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/21/2019. (AMP)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/21/2019. (AMP)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/21/2019. (AMP)
June 21, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc.. (Wolfe, Joshua)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number V190098P. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4004110), filed by Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc., Ronald Lott. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: State Court File)(Wolfe, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates et al v. Lott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy Weight Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lott
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald George Lott
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey A Yates
Represented By: Matthew B Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew C Yates
Represented By: Matthew B Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?