Vaughn v. Wyndham et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Joanne Vaughn
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., Allen Dale Heil and Wyndham Destinations, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00230
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 7/1/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eugene Podesta) (AYB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wyndham Destinations, Inc. (Strittmatter, Ashley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eugene Podesta) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4010391.) by Wyndham Destinations, Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Podesta Good Standing Cert.)(Strittmatter, Ashley)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Allen Dale Heil re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing State Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleading, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleading, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleading)(Evans, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/25/19. (ABF)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/25/19. (ABF)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/25/19. (ABF)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Allen, et al. v. Wyndham Worldwide Operations, Inc., et al., No. 3:18-CV-259. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered.Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/15/19. (ABF)
June 25, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wyndham Destinations, Inc, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to and Joinder in Removal (Holden, Jamie)
June 21, 2019 Forwarded to Magistrate Chambers for related case determination. (ABF)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Allen Dale Heil. (Evans, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Chancery, case number 18-12-302. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4004611), filed by Allen Dale Heil. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other State Court Complaint, #3 Other State Court Documents, #4 Other Notice to State Court)(Evans, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Wyndham et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J Podesta, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Ballinger Holden
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J Podesta, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Ballinger Holden
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Dale Heil
Represented By: Matthew J Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Destinations, Inc
Represented By: Eugene J Podesta, Jr
Represented By: Jamie Ballinger Holden
Represented By: Ashley M Strittmatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Vaughn
Represented By: Aubrey T Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?