Petry v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, et al
Plaintiff: Marvel Petry
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, and Pepsico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00242
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER Permitting Inspection of Medical, Employment, Educational, Social Security and Internal Revenue Service Records - Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/28/2019. (KMK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Agreed Medical Order by Pepsico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Order)(Wright, James)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 08/09/2019. (AMP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Marvel Petry (Talley, P)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Pepsico, Inc..(Wright, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions to PepsiCo, Inc.. (Wright, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Pepsico, Inc.. (Wright, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,.(Kern, Elle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Kern, Elle)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 3, 2019. (AYB)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 3, 2019. (AYB)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 3, 2019. (AYB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal: Please re-file the corporate disclosure statement as a separate filing using the ECF event "Certificate of Corporate Interest" located at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents (AYB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Attachment-Affidavit of Elle Kern by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Kern, Elle)
July 2, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 25983-IV. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4013726), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A-WM summons, #3 Exhibit B-Pepsico summons, #4 Exhibit C-Complaint, #5 Other Notice of filing Notice of Removal, #6 Other Corporate disclosure statement)(Kern, Elle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petry v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP,
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: James C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvel Petry
Represented By: P Richard Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?