State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Salley et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Enrique Orejuela and Amelia Wieand
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Jennifer Salley
3Rd Party Defendant: Josh Ellis Insurance Agency and Josh Ellis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00243
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019, at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in information will be circulated via e-mail.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/26/2019. (CMH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Amelia Wieand, Enrique Orejuela.(Warchol, Samantha)
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Salley. Josh Ellis served on 8/20/2019. (Hedrick, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 [WRONG EVENT USED; REFILED AS #27 ] SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Josh Ellis Insurance Agency on 08-20-2019 (Hedrick, Joshua) Modified on 8/20/2019 (ABF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Policy)(Carpenter, Brigid)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CONSENT Written Consent to Filing of Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Carpenter, Brigid)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019, at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. This will be a telephonic hearing, and dial-in information will be circulated by e-mail. Please disregard any references to location in the attachment.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 8/1/2019. (CMH)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/19. (ABF)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/19. (ABF)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/19. (ABF)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Amelia Wieand, et al. v. Jennifer Salley, No. 3:19-CV-174. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Travis R. McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 8/1/19. (ABF)
August 1, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Jennifer Salley of Service of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Hedrick, Joshua)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company of Service of Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMELIA WIEAND AND ENRIQUE OREJUELA'S RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Warchol, Samantha)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 Third Party Summons Issued as to Josh Ellis, Josh Ellis Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Summons Josh Ellis)(ABF)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Josh Ellis Insurance Agency, Josh Ellis, COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Jennifer Salley. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Hedrick, Joshua)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM counterclaims against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand.(Stovall, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne A Ritchie, II on behalf of Enrique Orejuela, Amelia Wieand (Ritchie, Wayne)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Enrique Orejuela served on 7/8/2019. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Amelia Wieand served on 7/8/2019. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Jennifer Salley served on 7/8/2019. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (BJL) Modified on 7/8/2019 (BJL).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BJL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Counsel: INFORMATIONAL ONLY. (BJL)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to be Issued - Jennifer Salley by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to be Issued - Enrique Orejuela by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons to be Issued - Amelia Wieand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Carpenter, Brigid)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Enrique Orejuela, Jennifer Salley, Amelia Wieand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4014455.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint in Case No. 3:19-cv-00174, #2 Exhibit 2 True & Correct Copy of the Insurance Policy, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other State Farm's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Carpenter, Brigid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Salley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Brigid M Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jennifer Salley
Represented By: Joshua D Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Orejuela
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Wieand
Represented By: Samantha Irina Warchol
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Josh Ellis Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Josh Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?