Moncier v. Collins II
Plaintiff: Herbert S. Moncier
Defendant: Richard E. Collins, II
Case Number: 3:2019cv00247
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion. Plaintiff shall be allowed to access the CM/ECF system, subject to the same terms and conditions that apply to other users. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 8/22/19. (JBR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 (Case at Issue) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge (JBR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Richard E. Collins, II.(Brown, Gregory)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION For Leave To Use The Court's Case Management Electronic Case Filing System by Herbert S. Moncier. (JBR)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Herbert S. Moncier) (CAT)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Herbert S. Moncier) (CAT)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 07/08/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Herbert S. Moncier) (CAT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Supplement : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file the Civil Cover Sheet in a non fillable format. (CAT)
July 8, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, [Civil Cover Sheet] by Richard E. Collins, II. (Field, Christopher)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Knox County, Tennessee, case number 3-192-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4015179), filed by Richard E. Collins, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings and Process Served on Defendant)(Brown, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncier v. Collins II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Collins, II
Represented By: Gregory Brown
Represented By: William Scott Hickerson
Represented By: Christopher C Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert S. Moncier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?