Arthur v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (PLR2)
Plaintiff: James Arthur
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00249
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Norfolk Southern Railway Company Service of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Baker, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by James Arthur of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hicky, William)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: the trial of this case will be held before the undersigned United States District Judge, with a jury, beginning on TUESDAY, JANAURY 12, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Knoxville, Tennessee in Courtroom 3C. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on July 30, 2019. (AYB)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on July 30, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Baker, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Baker, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr and Emily L. Herman-Thompson on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Baker, John) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (AYB).
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Arthur. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Hicky, William)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 7/11/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #8 MOTION for Charles Edward Sorey, II, to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4018559.) by James Arthur. (Hicky, William)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 07/08/2019. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 07/08/2019. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 07/08/2019. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP)
July 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by James Arthur of Filing Summons to be Issued (Hicky, William)
July 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by James Arthur re #1 Complaint of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Hicky, William)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4015317.), filed by James Arthur.(Hicky, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arthur
Represented By: William B Hicky
Represented By: Charles Edward Sorey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?