United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698 Stanford, Kentucky 40484 (TV2)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698, Stanford, Kentucky 40484 and Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698 Stanford, Kentucky 40484
Case Number: 3:2019cv00251
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED AFFIDAVIT re: #1 Complaint by United States of America. (ABF)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. The Court hereby STAYS this case until the related criminal investigation has been concluded and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level, either through a verdict or by way of a plea. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/8/19. (ABF)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/8/2019. (ICH)
August 1, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KMK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America . (Mohr, Gretchen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM against Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698, Stanford, Kentucky 40484, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698 Stanford, Kentucky 40484 (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698, Stanford, Kentucky 40484
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3115 Kentucky Highway 698 Stanford, Kentucky 40484
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?