In Re: Ioan Cocan
Plaintiff: Ioan Cocan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00256
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
2 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. "Forward Time Exp. Rtn to Send" Mail sent to Ioan Cocan re #9 Order Reassigning Case. (JBR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Letter. The Court finds the Plaintiff's motion and application to proceed in forma pauperis to be well-taken, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file The Letters in this case without prepayment of costs or fees. No process shall issue, however, until the District Judge has ruled upon this Report and Recommendation, because it is RECOMMENDED that The Letters be DISMISSED due to failure to state a claim, and that this case be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/23/19. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan at 6331 Pleasant Ridge Road, Apt. 1002, Knoxville, TN 37921) (JBR) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (JBR).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that Case No. 3:19-cv-00256-TRM-HBG is sufficiently related to the previously filed Case No. 3:17-cv-00283-PLR-HBG and 3:18-cv-00025-PLR-HBG, as they arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the cases are related. It is therefore ORDERED that to more efficiently utilize the Court's time and resources, In Re: Ioan Cocan, No. 3:19-cv-00256-TRM-HBG, is hereby REASSIGNED to Chief United States District Judge Pamela L. Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/23/19. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan) (JBR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable "Forward Time Exp Rtn to Send." re #6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, #7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, #4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address, #5 Order Governing Depositions (JBR) Modified to reflect copy re-mailed to Ioan Cocan at 6331 Pleasant Ridge Road, Apt. 1002, Knoxville, TN 37921) on 7/23/2019 (JBR).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/9/19. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan) (JBR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/9/19. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan) (JBR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/9/19. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan) (JBR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Ioan Cocan) (JBR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Ioan Cocan (JBR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Ioan Cocan requesting cases to be rejudged by the Federal Court (JBR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ioan Cocan. (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Ioan Cocan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ioan Cocan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?