Patterson v. Foster and Monroe, LLC

Plaintiff: Jesse Patterson
Defendant: Foster and Monroe, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00257
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jesse Patterson. Foster and Monroe, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2019. (Mize, Joshua)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 7/11/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/10/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Mize) (JBR)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/10/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Mize) (JBR)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/10/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Mize) (JBR) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (JBR).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Foster and Monroe, LLC. (Mailed original issued summons to Attorney Mize) (JBR)
July 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Jesse Patterson (JBR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Mize (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3038358) by Jesse Patterson. (JBR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Foster and Monroe, LLC (Filing fee $400.00, Receipt #K3038358), filed by Jesse Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Foster and Monroe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Patterson
Represented By: Joshua A Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster and Monroe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?