Salsedo et al v. Riverstone Rentals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristi Salsedo and Michel A Salsedo
Defendant: Shular Enterprises, Inc. and Riverstone Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/4/2019. (JCK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lewis, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Riverstone Rentals, LLC (Lewis, Andrew)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER,Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/23/2019. (JCK)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Shular Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Riverstone Resort & Spa by Kristi Salsedo, Michel A Salsedo (Cole, R.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Riverstone Rentals, LLC. (Lewis, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Riverstone Rentals, LLC.(Lewis, Andrew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jordan Lewis on behalf of Riverstone Rentals, LLC (Lewis, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michel A Salsedo, Kristi Salsedo. Riverstone Rentals, LLC served on 7/19/2019. (Cole, R.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/15/2019. (SAC)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/15/2019. (SAC)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/15/2019. (SAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel. Informational only. (SAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Riverstone Rentals, LLC, Shular Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Shular)(SAC)
July 15, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (SAC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Shular Enterprises, Inc. by Kristi Salsedo, Michel A Salsedo. (Cole, R.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons - Riverstone Rentals, LLC by Kristi Salsedo, Michel A Salsedo. (Cole, R.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Kristi Salsedo, Michel A Salsedo. (Cole, R.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4021398.), filed by Michel A Salsedo, Kristi Salsedo.(Cole, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salsedo et al v. Riverstone Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Salsedo
Represented By: R. Deno Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel A Salsedo
Represented By: R. Deno Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shular Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverstone Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jordan Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?