Melancon et al v. Weitzel et al
Plaintiff: Sherry J Melancon and Carlyle J Melancon
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, Inclusive and Michelle Weitzel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00266
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
2 Judge: Pamela L Reeves
3 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court finds the Defendant's motion and application to proceed in forma pauperis to be well-taken, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Notice of Removal in this case without prepayment of costs or fees. No process shall issue, however, until the District Judge has ruled upon this Report and Recommendation, because it is RECOMMENDED that the Notice of Removal be DISMISSED due to its jurisdictional deficiencies, and this case remanded to the Loudon County General Sessions Court. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (copy mailed to Michelle Weitzel) (JBR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Michelle Weitzel. (JBR)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that Case No. 3:19-CV-266-TAV-DCP is sufficiently related to the previously filed Case No. 3:19-cv-194-PLR-HBG. Case reassigned to District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/31/19. (JBR) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Michelle Weitzel on 7/31/2019 (JBR).
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Carlyle J Melancon, Sherry J Melancon. (Dickenson, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Carlyle J Melancon, Sherry J Melancon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Dickenson, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Michelle Weitzel) (JBR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Weitzel. (JBR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Loudon County General Sessions Court, case number 2019-cv-681 filed by Michelle Weitzel.(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melancon et al v. Weitzel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry J Melancon
Represented By: Thomas H Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlyle J Melancon
Represented By: Thomas H Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Weitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?