McClory et al v. Fleetway Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LaDonna Burgess and Tammy McClory
Defendant: Ralph Roccasalvo and Fleetway Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00273
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Fleetway Transport, Inc., Ralph Roccasalvo (Easterly, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/23/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 8/26/2019 to indcate c/m to Richard Evans and Williams Donnell (ABF).
August 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Fleetway Transport, Inc., #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Fleetway Transport, Inc. (AML)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Evans (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt No. C1016897) by Fleetway Transport, Inc. (AML)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William Donnell (Filing fee $ 90 paid, Receipt No. C1016897) by Fleetway Transport, Inc. (AML)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/14/19. (c/m to Nicholas B Snider, Morgan & Akins, PLLC, 2000 Richard Jones Road, Suite 260, Nashville, TN 37215) (ABF)
August 12, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AML)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas B. Snider. (AML)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Attorneys Nicholas Akins and Nicholas Snider are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before August 29, 2019, as to why they should not be removed as the attorneys of record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue for their failure to comply with the Courts Notice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Attorney Nicholas Akins and Nicholas Snider. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/12/19. (c/m to Nicholas S Akins & Nicholas Snider at Morgan & Akins, PLLC, 2000 Richard Jones Road, Suite 260, Nashville, TN 37215)(ABF)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/7/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff attorneys.
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Easterly, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/2019. (TRT)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) Modified on 7/26/2019 to indicate c/m to Nicholas Akins and Nicholas Snider (ABF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ralph Roccasalvo.(Easterly, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Fleetway Transport, Inc..(Easterly, Alan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2019, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/17/2019. (CMH)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/17/2019. (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Nicholas B. Snider and Nicholas S. Akins
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss,Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/17/2019. (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Nicholas B. Snider and Nicholas S. Akins
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/17/2019. (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Nicholas B. Snider and Nicholas S. Akins
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)*Mailed to Attorneys Nicholas B. Snider and Nicholas S. Akins.
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: The Civil Cover Sheet attached to the #1 Notice of Removal-INFORMATIONAL ONLY. (BJL)
July 16, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BJL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Fleetway Transport, Inc.. (Easterly, Alan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell County Circuit, case number 16948. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4024054), filed by Fleetway Transport, Inc., Ralph Roccasalvo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Campbell County filings, #2 Other Civil Cover, #3 Other Notice to State Court)(Easterly, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClory et al v. Fleetway Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna Burgess
Represented By: Nicholas S Akins
Represented By: Nicholas B Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy McClory
Represented By: Nicholas S Akins
Represented By: Nicholas B Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Roccasalvo
Represented By: Alan B Easterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetway Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Alan B Easterly
Represented By: William T Donnell
Represented By: Richard V Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?