Butturini v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Ryan Butturini and Ryan Christien Butturini
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00284
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Yoakum, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adkins, Micah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Equifax Information Services LLC Equifax Information Services, LLCs Initial Disclosures (Yoakum, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/15/19. (JBR)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant SHALL respond to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 8/15/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent Form) (JBR)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Equifax Information Services LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (Yoakum, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order will be submitted) by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Yoakum, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Reynolds, Rebecca)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reynolds, Rebecca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Christien Butturini. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/24/2019. (Adkins, Micah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Christien Butturini. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 7/25/2019. (Adkins, Micah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (SAC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/2019. (SAC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/2019. (SAC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/22/2019. (SAC)
July 22, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (SAC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4027370.), filed by Ryan Butturini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Adkins, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butturini v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Brian L Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Crawford Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Butturini
Represented By: Micah S. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Christien Butturini
Represented By: Micah S. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?