Veal v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: June L Veal, Kenneth W. Veal and June L. Veal
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc. and EAN Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00309
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/8/19. (CNC)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Curtis L Collier: Scheduling Conference held on 10/3/2019. ( No Court Reporter/No Courtroom Deputy present) (BJL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Cynthia R Wyrick terminated. (Wyrick, Cynthia)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Rowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rowell, Nathan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Bibb, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Kia Motors America, Inc. OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - As-Entered Partial Order of Compromise and Dismissal)(Kimerling, Whitney)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/14/2019. (CAT)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/14/2019. (CAT)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/14/2019. (CAT)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
August 14, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by EAN Holdings, LLC, Kia Motors America, Inc.(CAT)
August 14, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kia Motors America, Inc. of Removal to Adverse Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing to State Court)(Bibb, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kia Motors America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation for Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Bibb, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blount County Circuit Court, case number L19969. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4048693), filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Entire Court File, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Bibb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veal v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June L Veal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Veal
Represented By: Nathan D Rowell
Represented By: Cynthia R Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June L. Veal
Represented By: Nathan D Rowell
Represented By: Cynthia R Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr
Represented By: Whitney Henry Kimerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?