Burnum v. Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc
Plaintiff: Joshua E. Burnum
Defendant: Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00336
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/10/2019. (BDG)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Barnes, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc.. (Barnes, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua E. Burnum. Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc. served on 9/3/2019. (Nelson, Jesse)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/28/2019. (CAT)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/28/2019. (CAT)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/28/2019. (CAT)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc. (CAT)
August 28, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4065032.), filed by Joshua E Burnum. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nelson, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnum v. Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Lenoir City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua E. Burnum
Represented By: Jesse D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?