United States of America v. $19,300.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,300.00 U.S. Currency
Claimant: Grigori Saakjan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00341
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date October 11, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A / Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Exhibit B / Advertisement Copy)(Mohr, Gretchen)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Grigori Saakjan.(Herrick, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM Verified by Grigori Saakjan. (Herrick, Peter)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Grigori Saakjan served on 10/3/2019. (ABF)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/1/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified on 10/2/2019 to indicate c/m to Peter S Herrick, Peter S. Herrick PA, 4324 Bayshore Blvd NE, St. Petersburg, FL 33703(ABF).
October 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by $19,300.00 U.S. Currency (ABF)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3038880.) by $19,300.00 U.S. Currency. (ABF)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Grigori Saakjan c/o Peter Herrick served on 9/20/19. (ABF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Asset File 19-DEA-650602. (ABF)
September 5, 2019 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued. Forwarded to USMS along with completed 285 Form. (JBR)
September 4, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JBR)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America OF COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE (Mohr, Gretchen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $19,300.00 U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Mohr, Gretchen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (KMK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $19,300.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,300.00 U.S. Currency
Represented By: Peter S Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grigori Saakjan
Represented By: Peter S Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?