Export Development Canada v. House of Thaller, Inc. (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Defendant: House of Thaller, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00356
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to House of Thaller, Inc. (copy mailed to House of Thaller, Inc. c/o John Thaller Registered Agent, 1600 Harris Road, Knoxville, TN 37924) (JBR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Clerk's Default as to House of Thaller, Inc. by Export Development Canada. Party is instructed to email the proposed default to the clerk at the appropriate email address in accordance with #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/civil_forms. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean J. Lowe, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #3 Proposed Entry of Default)(Lowe, Sean)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Export Development Canada. House of Thaller, Inc. served on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit of service)(Lowe, Sean)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/17/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Sean Lowe on 9/18/2019 (JBR).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/12/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Lowe) (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/12/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Lowe) (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/12/19. (copy mailed to Attorney Lowe) (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to House of Thaller, Inc. (mailed to Attorney Lowe) (JBR)
September 12, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Export Development Canada (JBR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sean Lowe (Filing fee $90.00 paid, Receipt #K3038769) by Export Development Canada. (JBR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Export Development Canada. (JBR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against House of Thaller, Inc., filed by Export Development Canada. (Filing fee $400.00 paid, Receipt #K3038769) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Export Development Canada v. House of Thaller, Inc. (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Thaller, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Represented By: Sean Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?