Takeshige v. Bristol Broadcasting Company, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Ryuunosuke Takeshige
Defendant: Bristol Broadcasting Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00366
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. This matter is before the Court for case management purposes. Plaintiff filed this action on September 20, 2019. [Doc. 1]. Plaintiff failed to pay the civil action filing fee at the time of filing and was therefore ordered to pay the fee by September 30, 2019. [Doc. 2]. Plaintiff did not, and to date has not, paid the filing fee. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/2019. (BDG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Ryuunosuke Takeshige Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (AMP)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: No payment submitted. Please submit payment in the amount of $400.00. Also please refile the AO121 form in a non-fillable form using the event Patent and Trademark Notice under Other Documents. Requirements due by 9/30/2019. (AMP)
September 23, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol Broadcasting Company, Incorporated (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Ryuunosuke Takeshige. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takeshige v. Bristol Broadcasting Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryuunosuke Takeshige
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Broadcasting Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?