Mazzoni v. Synchrony Financial et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Roberto Mazzoni
Defendant: Synchrony Financial and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00373
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/2019. (CAT)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Synchrony Financial.(Criswell, Brandon)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Synchrony Bank.(Criswell, Brandon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Mazzoni. Synchrony Financial served on 10/2/2019. (Snyder, Brent)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Synchrony Financial identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Financial. (Criswell, Brandon)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Synchrony Bank identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Bank. (Criswell, Brandon)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Mazzoni. Synchrony Bank served on 10/1/2019. (Snyder, Brent)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Criswell, Brandon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Scott Criswell on behalf of All Defendants (Criswell, Brandon)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Synchrony Financial and Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons Synchrony Bank)(SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4087195.), filed by Roberto Mazzoni. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Synchrony Bank, #3 Summons Synchrony Financial)(Snyder, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzoni v. Synchrony Financial et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Mazzoni
Represented By: Brent S Snyder
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Represented By: Brandon Scott Criswell
Represented By: Stephanie D Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Brandon Scott Criswell
Represented By: Stephanie D Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?